Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 12/13/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/15/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/06/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/16/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/16/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/08/2012