Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 12/14/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 12/14/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 12/14/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 12/14/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 12/14/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 12/14/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/26/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 01/31/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/31/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 01/31/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/09/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/13/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/13/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/13/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/27/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/27/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 02/28/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/05/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/05/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/13/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/13/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/29/2012
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 03/29/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/16/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/16/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/23/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 05/08/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/04/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/04/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/04/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/04/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 06/19/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/29/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/19/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/26/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/30/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/30/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/31/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 08/01/2012