Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 12/14/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 12/14/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 12/14/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/26/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/26/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/08/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/14/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/17/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/24/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/30/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/30/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 08/01/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/01/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 08/02/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/02/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/02/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/02/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/02/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/21/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 11/26/2012