Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 12/14/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 12/14/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/15/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/16/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/23/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/26/2012