There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

American Job Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to protect American job creation by striking the job-killing Federal employer mandate.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/25/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
01/25/2011Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/25/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/26/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/31/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/01/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/01/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/17/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/06/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/28/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 06/28/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/11/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/18/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/13/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/20/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/20/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 11/29/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 01/23/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 01/24/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/28/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance01/25/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.20.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.20. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/25/2011)

American Job Protection Act - Repeals provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act that require large employers to offer their full-time employees the opportunity to enroll in minimum essential coverage. Applies the Internal Revenue Code as if such provisions had never been enacted.