Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 12/16/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 01/23/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 01/26/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 01/30/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/30/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/31/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/31/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/14/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/15/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/08/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/20/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/22/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/16/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 04/26/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/14/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/17/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/05/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/30/2012