Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 01/26/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/26/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/01/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/24/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/24/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/22/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/25/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/06/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 10/06/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 10/06/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/06/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/06/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/06/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/06/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 10/06/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/06/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 10/06/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/31/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/31/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/28/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/17/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/23/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/25/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/31/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 08/01/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 08/02/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 08/02/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/10/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/10/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/10/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/12/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/12/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/19/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/19/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/13/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 11/13/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/13/2012