There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

National Baseball Hall of Fame Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in recognition and celebration of the National Baseball Hall of Fame.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/26/2012Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/26/2012Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (70)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 01/26/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/26/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/26/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/26/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/01/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/01/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 03/14/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/14/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/14/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/14/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/14/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/14/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/14/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/14/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/14/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/14/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/14/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/14/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/14/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/14/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/14/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/14/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/14/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/14/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/14/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/14/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/17/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/17/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/17/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/17/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/07/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/11/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/11/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/12/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/20/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/20/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/20/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/20/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/20/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/20/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/20/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/20/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/20/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/20/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 06/20/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/20/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/20/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/20/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/20/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/20/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/20/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/20/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/20/2012
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/20/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/20/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/20/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/20/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/21/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/21/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/26/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/26/2012
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 06/20/2012 06/26/2012 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/26/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2036. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/26/2012)

National Baseball Hall of Fame Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue not more than 50,000 $5 gold coins, 400,000 $1 silver coins, and 750,000 half-dollar coins in recognition of the National Baseball Hall of Fame during the one-year period beginning on January 1, 2015.

Directs the Secretary to hold a competition to design the common obverse of the coins, with such design being emblematic of the game of baseball. Requires the design on the common reverse side to depict a baseball similar to those used by Major League Baseball.

Requires all sales of such coins to include specified surcharges, which shall be paid by the Secretary to the National Baseball Hall of Fame to help finance its operations.