Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/26/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/26/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/26/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/26/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/01/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/01/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 03/14/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/14/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/14/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/14/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/14/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/14/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/14/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/14/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/14/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/14/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/14/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/14/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/14/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/14/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/14/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/14/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/14/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/14/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/14/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/14/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/17/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/17/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/17/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/17/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/07/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/11/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/11/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/12/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/20/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/20/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/20/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/20/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/20/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/20/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/20/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/20/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/20/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/20/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/20/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/20/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/20/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/20/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/20/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/20/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/20/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/20/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/20/2012
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/20/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/20/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/20/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/20/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/21/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/21/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/26/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/26/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew