Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 01/31/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/01/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/01/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/01/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/01/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/01/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/27/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/29/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/23/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/14/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/13/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/21/2012