Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/31/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 01/31/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/31/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 01/31/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/31/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/14/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/15/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/14/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/20/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/27/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/16/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/16/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/17/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/17/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/18/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/23/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/23/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/23/2012