Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/01/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/26/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/07/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/06/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/07/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/18/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/19/2012