Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/07/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/07/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/13/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/14/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/29/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 04/18/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/07/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/15/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/22/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/23/2012