Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/24/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/10/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/11/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/17/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/26/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/31/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/11/2012