Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 02/09/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/13/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/15/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/15/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 02/15/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/16/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/16/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/16/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/28/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/02/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/26/2012