Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 01/26/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/03/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/03/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/10/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/10/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/10/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/10/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/10/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 02/10/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/14/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/15/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/16/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/16/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/17/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 03/30/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/05/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/12/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/06/2012