Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/15/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/01/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/08/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/15/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/15/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/26/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/26/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/29/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/29/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/17/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/18/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 04/23/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 04/24/2012
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 04/24/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 04/25/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/25/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/25/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/25/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/25/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/25/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/10/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/10/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/14/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/06/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/14/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/20/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/21/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/21/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/25/2012