Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 01/27/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/27/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/27/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/27/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/27/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/27/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 01/27/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/27/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 02/07/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/14/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/14/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/28/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/17/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/17/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/17/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/17/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/17/2011
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/17/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/04/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 04/05/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/05/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/05/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/05/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/07/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/07/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/07/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/12/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 04/14/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/03/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/04/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/30/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/18/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 10/04/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 10/11/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 10/20/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/20/2011