Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/29/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/26/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/28/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/16/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/23/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/24/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/26/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/11/2012