Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/17/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/17/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/17/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/17/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/17/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/13/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/08/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/04/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/05/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/02/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/19/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/21/2012