Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/05/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/08/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/12/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/19/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/27/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/28/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/24/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/16/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/17/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/22/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/23/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/23/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/05/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/07/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/11/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/11/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/20/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/09/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/16/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/19/2012