Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/01/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/01/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/01/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/01/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/01/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/06/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/20/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/27/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/24/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/22/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/07/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/11/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/31/2012