Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/01/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/14/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/14/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/02/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/03/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/12/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/12/2012