Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/06/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/15/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/22/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/27/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/28/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/25/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/25/2012