Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 03/06/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/19/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/26/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/28/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/28/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/16/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/19/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/07/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/09/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/15/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/22/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/10/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/10/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/21/2012