There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

United States-Israel Enhanced Security Cooperation Act of 2012

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

United States-Israel Enhanced Security Cooperation Act of 2012

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

United States-Israel Enhanced Security Cooperation Act of 2012

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

United States-Israel Enhanced Security Cooperation Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

United States-Israel Enhanced Security Cooperation Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to enhance strategic cooperation between the United States and Israel, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
07/27/2012Became Public Law No: 112-150. (TXT | PDF)
07/27/2012Signed by President.
07/19/2012Presented to President.
07/17/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4884-4885)
06/29/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S4779-4780; text as passed in Senate: CR S4779-4780)
06/27/2012Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 112-179.
03/06/2012Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/27/2012Became Public Law No: 112-150. (TXT | PDF)
07/27/2012Signed by President.
07/19/2012SenatePresented to President.
07/17/2012-5:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/17/2012-5:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4884-4885)
07/17/2012-5:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2165.
07/17/2012-5:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4884-4888)
07/17/2012-5:19pmHouseMs. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/09/2012-6:26pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/09/2012-2:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/29/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/29/2012SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4779-4780; text as passed in Senate: CR S4779-4780)
06/27/2012SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 437.
06/27/2012SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 112-179.
06/19/2012SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/06/2012SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/06/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/06/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/19/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/21/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/22/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/26/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/26/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/27/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/28/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/29/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/16/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/16/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/16/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/17/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/18/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/18/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/19/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/19/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/23/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/23/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/23/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 04/24/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/24/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/24/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/24/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/26/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 04/26/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/26/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/07/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 05/07/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/07/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/08/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/10/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/10/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/10/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/10/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/14/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/14/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/14/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/14/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/14/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/14/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/16/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/16/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/21/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/21/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/21/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/22/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/24/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/05/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/05/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/06/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/06/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/06/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/07/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/11/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/11/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/11/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/12/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/13/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/13/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/18/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/19/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/20/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/26/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/26/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/27/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/28/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/29/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/29/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/16/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations03/06/2012 Referred to
06/19/2012 Markup by
06/27/2012 Reported by S. Rept. 112-179

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.2165. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-150 (07/27/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on June 27, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

United States-Israel Enhanced Security Cooperation Act of 2012 - (Sec. 3) States that it is U.S. policy to: (1) reaffirm the commitment to Israel's security as a Jewish state, (2) support Israel's right to self-defense and help Israel preserve its qualitative military edge, (3) expand military and civilian cooperation, (4) assist in a negotiated settlement of the Israeli-Palestinian conflict that results in two states living side-by-side in peace and security, and (5) veto any one-sided anti-Israel U.N. Security Council resolutions.

(Sec. 4) Expresses the sense of Congress that the United States should take specified actions to assist in Israel's defense, including: (1) enhancing development and production of joint missile defense systems, (2) providing appropriate defense articles and services, (3) strengthening security initiatives and bilateral training exercises, and (4) encouraging an expanded role for Israel with the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO).

(Sec. 5) Amends the Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2005 to extend authority to transfer certain obsolete or surplus Department of Defense (DOD) items to Israel. Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to extend authority to make additions to foreign-based defense stockpiles. Amends the Emergency Wartime Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2003 to extend specified loan guarantee authority to Israel.

(Sec. 6) Directs the President to submit reports to Congress regarding: (1) the status of Israel's qualitative military edge; (2) actions that could improve the process related to Israel's purchase of F-35 aircraft; (3) cooperation between the United States and Israel in homeland security, counter-terrorism, maritime security, energy, cyber-security, and other related areas; and (4) actions to integrate Israel into the defense of the Eastern Mediterranean.