Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/06/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/06/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/14/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/19/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/21/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/22/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/26/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/26/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/27/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/28/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/29/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/16/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/16/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/16/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/17/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/18/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/18/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/19/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/19/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/23/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/23/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/23/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 04/24/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/24/2012
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/24/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/24/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/26/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 04/26/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/26/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/07/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 05/07/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/07/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/08/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/10/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/10/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/10/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/10/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/14/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/14/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/14/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/14/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/14/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/14/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/16/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/16/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/21/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/21/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/21/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/22/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/24/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/05/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/05/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/06/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/06/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/06/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/07/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/11/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/11/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/11/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/12/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/13/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/13/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/18/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/19/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/20/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/26/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/26/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/27/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/28/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/29/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/29/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/16/2012