Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/28/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/23/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/14/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/18/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/21/2012