Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/12/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/18/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/24/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/25/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/13/2012