Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/07/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/26/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/26/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/26/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/26/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/26/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/26/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/26/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/26/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/26/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/26/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 04/26/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/26/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/21/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/11/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/17/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 08/01/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 08/01/2012