Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/08/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 03/08/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 03/08/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 03/08/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/13/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/14/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/19/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/26/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/16/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/07/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/07/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/14/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/17/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/23/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/21/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/28/2012