Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/13/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/13/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/16/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/21/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 06/25/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/26/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/28/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/29/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/10/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/10/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/31/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/19/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/20/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/13/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/26/2012