Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 03/15/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 03/15/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/15/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 03/15/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/15/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/15/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/21/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/04/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/29/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/23/2012