Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 03/22/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/27/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 04/18/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/24/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/08/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/08/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/08/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 05/08/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/09/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/10/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/10/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/14/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/14/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/22/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/24/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/07/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/07/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/13/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/27/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/17/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 07/19/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/25/2012