Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/20/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/27/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/03/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 12/11/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/12/2012