Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 03/21/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/22/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/26/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/28/2012
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/16/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/25/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/25/2012
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 04/26/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/05/2012