There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Preserving America's Family Farms Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit the Secretary of Labor from finalizing a proposed rule under the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 relating to child labor.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/21/2012Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
03/21/2012Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 03/21/2012
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/21/2012
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/22/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 03/22/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/26/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/26/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/27/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/28/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions03/21/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2221. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/21/2012)

Preserving America's Family Farms Act - Prohibits the Secretary of Labor from finalizing or enforcing proposed rule "Child Labor Regulations, Orders and Statements of Interpretation; Child Labor Violations-Civil Money Penalties" (relating to child labor in agricultural and nonagricultural occupations) issued pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act and published on September 2, 2011.