Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/21/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/21/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/22/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/22/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/27/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/27/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/27/2012
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/27/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/28/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/14/2012