Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 03/26/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/26/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/26/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/26/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 03/26/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/26/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 03/26/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/27/2012
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/27/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/28/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/16/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/08/2012