Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/17/2012
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/25/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/25/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/25/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/26/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/09/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/10/2012