Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/27/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/27/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/27/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/07/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/22/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/18/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/20/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/20/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/25/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/25/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/26/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/27/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/27/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/27/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/29/2012
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/29/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/11/2012