Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/29/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/29/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/29/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/29/2012
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/17/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/17/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/17/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/06/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/18/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/19/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/30/2012