Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/31/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 01/31/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 02/04/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/04/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/07/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/07/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 02/10/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/15/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/02/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/03/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/09/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 03/28/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/15/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 12/16/2011