Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/29/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/16/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/16/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/24/2012
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/25/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/08/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/04/2012