As of 02/19/2019 text has not been received for S.2282 - North American Wetlands Conservation Extension Act of 2012

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

North American Wetlands Conservation Extension Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

North American Wetlands Conservation Extension Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the authorization of appropriations to carry out approved wetlands conservation projects under the North American Wetlands Conservation Act through fiscal year 2017.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/19/2012Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 112-217.
03/29/2012Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
09/19/2012Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 519.
Action By: Senate
09/19/2012Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 112-217.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
07/25/2012Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
04/24/2012Committee on Environment and Public Works Senate Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-968.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife
03/29/2012Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Action By: Senate
03/29/2012Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2256-2257)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works03/29/2012 Referred to
07/25/2012 Markup by
09/19/2012 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife04/24/2012 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2282. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (09/19/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

North American Wetlands Conservation Extension Act of 2012 - Amends the North American Wetlands Conservation Act to extend through FY2017 the authorization of appropriations for allocations to carry out approved wetlands conservation projects.