Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/29/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/29/2012
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/29/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/29/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/29/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/29/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/24/2012
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/24/2012
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/24/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/24/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/24/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/22/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/05/2012
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/07/2012