Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/17/2012
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/24/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/17/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/23/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/12/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/20/2012