Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 01/27/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/15/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/17/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/17/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/28/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/01/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/01/2011