Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/19/2012
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 04/19/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/23/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/23/2012
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/23/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/25/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/26/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/26/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/26/2012
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/26/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/07/2012
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/07/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/08/2012
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/10/2012
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/10/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/10/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/14/2012
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/15/2012
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/17/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/06/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/20/2012
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/18/2012