Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 04/24/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/25/2012
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/08/2012
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/11/2012
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/18/2012
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/25/2012
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/11/2012
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/23/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/25/2012